Global Patent Index - EP 1160921 A2

EP 1160921 A2 2001-12-05 - Connector for connecting wires to a circuit board

Title (en)

Connector for connecting wires to a circuit board

Title (de)

Steckverbinder zum Anschliessen elektrischer Leitungen an eine Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour connecter des fils à une carte à circuits

Publication

EP 1160921 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112515 A

Priority

DE 20009788 U

Abstract (en)

The plug connector is composed of a casing (10) mounted on a printed circuit board (50), which is equipped with windows (11) at a front, and which serves as contact carrier for receiving contact elements (60). An insert element (20) inserted in an aperture (12) opposite the windows, can be fixed in a first position (I) and a second end position (II). A conductor (40) is clamped between a support surface (21) with an extrusion (22) and a clamping element (30) fastened at the insert element. An end of a wire (41) of the conductor contacts a contact element (60) in the final position, which comprises a contact section projecting from the window, connected with a conductor path (51) of the printed circuit board.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Steckverbinder zum Anschließen elektrischer Leitungen an eine Leiterplatte bereitzustellen, mit dem sich auf vergleichsweise einfache Weise eine verlässliche Zugentlastung und zuverlässige Kontaktierung der elektrischen Leitung erzielen lassen, wird mit vorliegender Erfindung ein Steckverbinder vorgeschlagen, der aus einem auf der Leiterplatte (40) befestigbaren Gehäuse (10), das an einer Stirnseite mit voneinander beabstandeten Fenstern (11) versehen ist und in diesen Bereichen als Kontaktträger zur Aufnahme von Kontaktelementen (42) dient, und einem in eine den Fenstern (11) gegenüberliegende Öffnung (12) des Gehäuses (10) einsteckbaren Einschubelement (16), das in einer ersten Sicherungsstellung (1) und einer zweiten Endstellung (II) im Gehäuse (10) arretierbar ist und eine die elektrische Leitung positionierende und mit einer Ausnehmung (18) versehene Auflagefläche (17) aufweist, besteht, wobei die elektrische Leitung zwischen der Auflagefläche (17) und einem an dem Einschubelement (16) rastend festlegbaren Klemmelement (26), an dem wenigstens ein in die Ausnehmung (35) eingreifender Vorsprung (27) angeordnet ist, einklemmbar ist, und wobei das isolationsfreie Ende einer Ader der elektrischen Leitung einen im Gehäuse (10) befindlichen Steckbereich eines einzelnen Kontaktelements in der Endstellung (II) des in das Gehäuse (10) eingeführten Einschubelements (16) kontaktiert und ein aus den Fenstern (11) herausführbarer Anschlussbereich des Kontaktelements mit einer Leiterbahn (41) der Leiterplatte (40) elektrisch leitend verbindbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/82 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/82 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009788 U1 20000907; EP 1160921 A2 20011205; EP 1160921 A3 20030108; EP 1160921 B1 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101813 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI