Global Patent Index - EP 1160922 A2

EP 1160922 A2 2001-12-05 - Printed board connector

Title (en)

Printed board connector

Title (de)

Leiterplattensteckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour une plaque de circuits

Publication

EP 1160922 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112075 A

Priority

DE 10027556 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has an insulating housing containing angled contact elements (40) with a plug side (41), a connecting region (44) and a connection side with contact ends (43) for mounting on a circuit board (9). A channel (6) in the insulating housing extends parallel and perpendicular to the surface of the circuit board and is arranged so that the connecting regions of the contact elements protrude into the channel.

Abstract (de)

Für einen kompakten Leiterplattensteckverbinder zur Montage auf einer Leiterplatte, der gleichzeitig mit weiteren elektrischen Bauteilen in einem Umluft-Heizofen mit der Leiterplatte verlötet werden soll, wobei das Lot in Form einer Lotpaste zum Verlöten der Bauteile verwendet wird, wird zur schnellen Erreichung der erforderlichen Löttemperatur an den Lötenden der Kontaktelemente des Leiterplattensteckverbinders vorgeschlagen, bestimmte Kontaktabschnitte der Kontaktelemente, durch innerhalb des Leiterplattensteckverbinders verlaufende Kanäle, mit einem darin zirkulierenden heißen Gasstrom möglichst schnell aufzuheizen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20; H01R 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/72 (2011.01); H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01); H05K 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/727 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160922 A2 20011205; EP 1160922 A3 20030226; EP 1160922 B1 20041201; CA 2349081 A1 20011202; CA 2349081 C 20060718; CN 1142616 C 20040317; CN 1329378 A 20020102; DE 10027556 C1 20011129; JP 2002033144 A 20020131; JP 3423700 B2 20030707; US 2001049229 A1 20011206; US 6514103 B2 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104655

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120528

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120529

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120528

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120528

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104655 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/20 A

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/18 B

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/20 A

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 23/70 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI