Global Patent Index - EP 1160924 A1

EP 1160924 A1 2001-12-05 - Electrical connection device for an electrical male contact and casing for receiving such a device

Title (en)

Electrical connection device for an electrical male contact and casing for receiving such a device

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindungsanordnung für einen elektrischen Kontaktstift und Gehäuse zum Aufnehmen eines solchen kontaktes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison électrique pour organe de contact électrique mâle et élément de boîtier destiné à recevoir un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1160924 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401333 A

Priority

FR 0006931 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connection has a body with a protrusion (8) in the rear wall. A folded stripped wire (20) is wrapped around the protrusion. A tongue section (14) slides into place in front of the wire clamping it into position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115; H01R 4/16; H01R 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 4/16 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/113 (2013.01); H01R 4/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160924 A1 20011205; FR 2809872 A1 20011207; FR 2809872 B1 20020809; JP 2002008743 A 20020111; US 2001049228 A1 20011206; US 6409554 B2 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO ELECTRONIQUE ET SYSTEMES DE LIAISON

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT SE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI