Global Patent Index - EP 1160932 A1

EP 1160932 A1 2001-12-05 - Waterproof electrical connection device for electrodes by shielded cables and petrophysical measuring system

Title (en)

Waterproof electrical connection device for electrodes by shielded cables and petrophysical measuring system

Title (de)

Wasserdichte elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtung für Elektroden mit geschirmten Kable und System für Petrophysicalische Messungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique étanche d'électrodes par cable blinde et système pour mesures petrophysiques utilisant le dispositif

Publication

EP 1160932 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401295 A

Priority

FR 0007123 A

Abstract (en)

A tubular protector sleeve (M) is fastened to wall (18) of an enclosure. Plugs (24,28) are connected to electrodes (E,15) with a base plate that fits into inner cavity of the sleeve. The plug is electrically connected to core (21) of shielded cable inside a metal tube (23). Seals (19,25) are provided to insulate the inside of the enclosure from outside and inner cavity of the tubular sleeve. An Independent claim is also included for physical quantity measurement system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/52 (2013.01); H01R 13/5205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160932 A1 20011205; CA 2349396 A1 20011202; FR 2809821 A1 20011207; FR 2809821 B1 20020920; NO 20012733 A 20011203; NO 20012733 D0 20010601; US 2001046811 A1 20011129; US 6571606 B2 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071201

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB IT NL

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI