Global Patent Index - EP 1161120 A2

EP 1161120 A2 2001-12-05 - Electric heaters

Title (en)

Electric heaters

Title (de)

Elektrische Heizelemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage

Publication

EP 1161120 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01115655 A

Priority

  • EP 98904301 A
  • GB 9703225 A

Abstract (en)

A thick film electric heater 1 comprises an insulating substrate 5 provided with a thick film resistive heating track 7. The resistive track 7 comprises at least two discrete sections connected by a bridge 11 of a material having a resistivity lower than that of the resistive track, such as silver. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/82; H05B 3/26; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/26 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01); H05B 3/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/748 (2013.01); H05B 3/262 (2013.01); H05B 3/82 (2013.01); H05B 2203/013 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01); H05B 2203/037 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2322273 A 19980819; GB 2322273 B 20010530; GB 9703225 D0 19970409; AU 6224398 A 19980908; CN 1130108 C 20031203; CN 1248384 A 20000322; CN 2325704 Y 19990623; DE 69803586 D1 20020314; DE 69803586 T2 20020808; EP 1013148 A1 20000628; EP 1013148 B1 20020123; EP 1161120 A2 20011205; EP 1161120 A3 20040121; ES 2171290 T3 20020901; HK 1029484 A1 20021108; WO 9836618 A1 19980820; ZA 9801287 B 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120104

2008-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080410

2005-12-07 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DEESFRGBITNL

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 3/82 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 3/74 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 3/26 B

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1013148

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL