Global Patent Index - EP 1161163 A1

EP 1161163 A1 2001-12-12 - GUIDE FITTINGS FOR PULLING-OUT DRAWERS

Title (en)

GUIDE FITTINGS FOR PULLING-OUT DRAWERS

Title (de)

AUSZIEHFÜHRUNGSGARNITUR FÜR SCHUBLADEN

Title (fr)

GARNITURE DE GUIDAGE D'EXTRACTION POUR TIROIRS

Publication

EP 1161163 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01901007 A

Priority

  • AT 0100005 W
  • AT 502000 A
  • AT 4012000 A
  • AT 12352000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150916A1] The invention relates to guide fittings for pulling-out drawers (1) or the like. The inventive fittings comprise a drawer rail (5) on the side of the drawer, a support rail (3) on the side of the body and a central rail (6) that runs between said two rails (3, 5) and is situated on both sides of the drawer (1). The weight of the drawer (1) is transmitted between the rails (3, 5, 6) and by means of rollers (14). A damping device (7) is active between two of the rails (3, 5, 6) and comprises at least two components which can be moved in relation to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01); A47B 88/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/467 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0037 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0056 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0094 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150916 A1 20010719; AT 270512 T 20040715; AT 410506 B 20030526; AT A12352000 A 20021015; AU 2651901 A 20010724; BR 0104013 A 20020102; BR 0104013 B1 20090505; CN 1147260 C 20040428; CN 1362866 A 20020807; DE 50102781 D1 20040812; EP 1161163 A1 20011212; EP 1161163 B1 20040707; ES 2222333 T3 20050201; JP 2003519516 A 20030624; JP 4712269 B2 20110629; US 2003067257 A1 20030410

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50102781

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A47B0088040000

- IPC: A47B0088400000

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222333 T3

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102781 P 20040812

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JULIUS BLUM GMBH

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI