Global Patent Index - EP 1161164 A1

EP 1161164 A1 2001-12-12 - GUIDE FITTINGS FOR PULLING OUT DRAWERS

Title (en)

GUIDE FITTINGS FOR PULLING OUT DRAWERS

Title (de)

AUSZIEHFÜHRUNGSGARNITUR FÜR SCHUBLADEN

Title (fr)

GARNITURE DE GUIDAGE D'EXTRACTION POUR TIROIRS

Publication

EP 1161164 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01942283 A

Priority

  • AT 0100006 W
  • AT 502000 A
  • AT 4012000 A
  • AT 18352000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150917A1] The invention relates to guide fittings for pulling out drawers (1). The inventive fittings comprise a pull-out rail (5) on the side of the drawer and a support rail (3) on the side of the body on both sides of the drawer respectively. A central rail (6) is optionally arranged between the support rail (3) and the pull-out rail (5) in such a way that said central rail can be displaced. The pull-out rail (5) is inserted into a drawer frame and is fixed therein. A damper is provided which damps the pulling-in movement of the pull-out rail (5) before said rail reaches the final rear position. The damper (10) impinges a traveller (9) which is displaceably guided on the pull-out rail (5). The traveller (9) is provided with a stopper (8). The traveller, together with said stopper, comes to rest on the body rail (3) or the central rail (6) before the pull-out rail (5) reaches the final rear position thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/16 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/467 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0037 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0056 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0094 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150917A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150917 A1 20010719; AT 255832 T 20031215; AU 2817001 A 20010724; BR 0104014 A 20020102; BR 0104014 B1 20090505; CN 1179689 C 20041215; CN 1358071 A 20020710; CN 1530054 A 20040922; DE 50101107 D1 20040122; EP 1161164 A1 20011212; EP 1161164 B1 20031210; ES 2210172 T3 20040701; JP 2003519517 A 20030624; JP 4605970 B2 20110105; US 6752478 B1 20040622

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50101107

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A47B0088040000

- IPC: A47B0088400000

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210172 T3

2004-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101107 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI