Global Patent Index - EP 1161173 A1

EP 1161173 A1 2001-12-12 - RUCKSACK APPLICATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

RUCKSACK APPLICATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

RUCKSACK-AUFTRAGEGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL APPLICATEUR PORTABLE SUR LE DOS

Publication

EP 1161173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912541 A

Priority

  • DE 19911131 A
  • EP 0001832 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054647A1] The invention relates to a device for applying flowing media to a surface. Said device comprises a container (1) for the media with at least one opening (2, 3) which is located above the surface and can be deaerated and a mopping or applicator device (5) which is attached to a handle (4). In addition, the device has a flow-regulating hose (6) which can be shut off, for conveying the media from the container (1) by force of gravity to an outlet on the mopping or applicator device (5). In addition, the device has a portable unit which is worn on the back, comprising supporting and fixing straps (8) and a mounting plate (9) which is fitted to said unit and which has a rapid-action coupling device. The container has (1) a resealable exit opening at one end (2) with a connecting sleeve and a resealable fill opening (3) at the opposite end, in addition to a hose adapter (11) which can be connected to the connecting sleeve of the exit opening (2). Said adapter has a shut-off device (12) and a rapid-action coupling (13) for the hose with a drip-protection unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 3/20 (2006.01); A46B 11/00 (2006.01); A46B 11/04 (2006.01); A47L 1/08 (2006.01); A47L 13/22 (2006.01); A47L 13/26 (2006.01); A47L 13/30 (2006.01); F16D 3/223 (2006.01); F16D 3/224 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/30 (2013.01); A46B 11/063 (2013.01); A46B 17/02 (2013.01); A47L 13/22 (2013.01); A46B 2200/302 (2013.01); A46B 2200/3033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054647 A1 20000921; AT 250383 T 20031015; AT 369067 T 20070815; DE 19911131 C1 20010118; DE 50003832 D1 20031030; DE 50014552 D1 20070920; DK 1161173 T3 20031215; EP 1161173 A1 20011212; EP 1161173 B1 20030924; EP 1360924 A2 20031112; EP 1360924 A3 20040609; EP 1360924 B1 20070808; US 2004033101 A1 20040219; US 2005019085 A1 20050127; US 2006024119 A1 20060202; US 2009257812 A1 20091015; US 6550998 B1 20030422; US 6799916 B2 20041005; US 6951430 B2 20051004; US 7621686 B2 20091124; US 7670073 B2 20100302

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003832

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003832

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040224

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOLAB INC.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040104

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-12-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003832 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB INC.

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE