Global Patent Index - EP 1161219 A1

EP 1161219 A1 2001-12-12 - INFANT FEEDING CONTAINER

Title (en)

INFANT FEEDING CONTAINER

Title (de)

SAUGFLASCHE

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT DESTINE A NOURRIR UN NOURRISSON

Publication

EP 1161219 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912528 A

Priority

US 9905611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054726A1] An infant feeding container is disclosed which attempts to imitate a human female breast in form and function. The container comprises a dome shaped member including a pliant outer surface. The dome shaped member substantially defines a volumetric space adequate to contain from four to eleven ounces of liquid and has the approximate form of a human female breast. The dome portion includes an upper crest and a lower skirt, the skirt portion being not less than seven centimeters in diameter at its outermost circumference. A ducted nipple protrudes from the crest of the dome and a bottom closure is secured to the dome portion adjacent to the skirt portion. Included are double and triple wall embodiments, a unique removable liner, optional means to couple the container to a conventional breast pump, an anti-vacuum feature, thermographic means to warn against overheated contents, and jackets in infant friendly materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 9/00 (2006.01); A61J 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 11/045 (2013.01); A61J 9/001 (2013.01); A61J 9/005 (2013.01); A61J 11/0045 (2013.01); A61J 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054726A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054726 A1 20000921; AU 3088899 A 20001004; CA 2367458 A1 20000921; CA 2367458 C 20101130; DE 69940322 D1 20090305; EP 1161219 A1 20011212; EP 1161219 B1 20090114; EP 1161219 B8 20090909

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130317

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120314

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940322

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-03-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PRENTISS, JOHN G.

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940322 P 20090305

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MORRILL, JENNIFER

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRENTISS, JESSICA

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORRILL, JENNIFER

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRENTISS, JESSICA

2006-10-25 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-05-04 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030107

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT