Global Patent Index - EP 1161242 A1

EP 1161242 A1 2001-12-12 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING DIABETES

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING DIABETES

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE

Publication

EP 1161242 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00905774 A

Priority

  • US 0002056 W
  • US 23976499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044382A1] A pharmaceutical composition for treating diabetes, contains more that 600 mg of a compound of formula (I) where Y is O; R is NHCONR<4>R<5>; or N=C(NR<4>R<5>)2. Also, another pharmaceutical composition for treating diabetes, contains a compound selected from the group consisting of compounds of formula (I) where Y is O; R is OH.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/495; A61K 31/4965

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 241/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/4965 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 241/28 (2006.01); C07D 241/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4965 (2013.01); A61K 31/495 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/495 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044382 A1 20000803; AU 2740500 A 20000818; CA 2360687 A1 20000803; EP 1161242 A1 20011212; EP 1161242 A4 20040630; JP 2002535369 A 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041115

2004-06-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/4965 B

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI