Global Patent Index - EP 1161282 A1

EP 1161282 A1 2001-12-12 - OXYGEN INHALER MASK WITH SOUND PICKUP DEVICE

Title (en)

OXYGEN INHALER MASK WITH SOUND PICKUP DEVICE

Title (de)

SAUERSTOFFINHALATIONSMASKE MIT SCHALLAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MASQUE INHALATEUR D'OXYGENE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE PRISE DE SON

Publication

EP 1161282 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99956097 A

Priority

  • FR 9902853 W
  • FR 9814854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2786107A1] The oxygen mask (1) has a supple body with a breathing tube aperture (A) and a microphone capsule (2) positioned above it. A horn (C) is mounted on the front of the capsule with its opening turned towards the wearer's mouth. The open end of the horn is elliptical in shape with its longer axis in line with the parting between the lips, and it can contain a metal mesh screen. In addition, a deflector (D) is fitted between the capsule and the breathing tube aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 7/14 (2006.01); A62B 18/08 (2006.01); B64D 13/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0030716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2786107 A1 20000526; FR 2786107 B1 20010216; AU 1277700 A 20000613; AU 756473 B2 20030116; DE 69919907 D1 20041007; DE 69919907 T2 20050922; EP 1161282 A1 20011212; EP 1161282 B1 20040901; IL 143327 A 20040512; IL 143327 D0 20020421; JP 2003512087 A 20030402; US 6997178 B1 20060214; WO 0030716 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919907 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REYNAUD, GERARDTHOMSON-CSF PROPR.INTELLECTUEL

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE