Global Patent Index - EP 1161284 A1

EP 1161284 A1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE FOR WASHING AND TRANSPORTING GOLF BALLS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR WASHING AND TRANSPORTING GOLF BALLS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM WASCHEN UND BEFÖRDERN VON GOLFBÄLLEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE ET DE TRANSPORT POUR BALLES DE GOLF

Publication

EP 1161284 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00914090 A

Priority

  • EP 0001589 W
  • NL 1011448 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0051691A1] A golf ball washing and transporting device that, by way of rotating brushes (1 to 8), not only washes the golf balls (10) but at the same time transports them to the required level so that the golf balls can be collected with no further means in a ball reservoir and whereby the flow of water from the sprayers (14) rinses the balls from the opposite direction so that the dirtiest balls are washed with the dirtiest water and as they gradually become cleaner they are also rinsed with the cleanest water, ensuring in this way an efficient washing effect using as little water as possible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 47/04 (2013.01); A63B 2047/046 (2013.01); A63B 2102/32 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051691A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0051691 A1 20000908; DE 60003793 D1 20030814; DE 60003793 T2 20040715; EP 1161284 A1 20011212; EP 1161284 B1 20030709; NL 1011448 C1 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003793 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE