Global Patent Index - EP 1161287 A1

EP 1161287 A1 2001-12-12 - IMPROVED GAMING TABLE TRACKING SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

IMPROVED GAMING TABLE TRACKING SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES SPIELTISCHTRACKINGSYSTEM UND METHODE

Title (fr)

TABLES DE JEUX, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SUIVI DES JETONS AMELIORES

Publication

EP 1161287 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97949426 A

Priority

US 9720771 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925439A1] A fully automated accounting system (11) accurately and automatically monitors and records all gaming chip transactions in a casino. The system employs a gaming chip (13) having a transponder (17) embedded therein to provide an instantaneous inventory of all of the gaming chips in the casino, including those in storage in the vault (75) as well as the chips in the cashiers cage (77), and at each gaming table (19) on the casino floor. The system is capable of reporting the total value of the gaming chips at any location. The transaction history of each chip may be maintained in a data base embedded in the chip, and read each time the gaming chip is scanned by a special antenna (29). If the chip is not where it is supposed to be according to its recorded transactional history, it will be identified and may be invalidated by nullifying a special casino security code.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 1/06; A44C 21/00; G06K 19/077; G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01); A63F 3/00 (2006.01); A63F 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3251 (2013.01); A63F 3/0005 (2013.01); A63F 3/00157 (2013.01); A63F 2009/2489 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB MC

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925439 A1 19990527; AU 2704799 A 19990607; EP 1161287 A1 20011212; EP 1161287 A4 20041117

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1043953

2006-12-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061101

2005-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHUFFLE MASTER, INC.

2005-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRENCH, JOHN

2004-11-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 1/06 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 19/077 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44C 21/00 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/32 B

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRENCH, JOHN

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIEHL, WILLIAM

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRENCH, JOHN

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIEHL, WILLIAM

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB MC