Global Patent Index - EP 1161299 A1

EP 1161299 A1 2001-12-12 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO COMPLEXANTS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO COMPLEXANTS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN ZU KOMPLEXBILDNERN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A DES AGENTS COMPLEXANTS

Publication

EP 1161299 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00907874 A

Priority

  • GB 0000962 W
  • GB 9905867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054881A1] The invention provides a complexant for complexing an anion, particularly, but not exclusively, a pertechnetate anion. The complexant has at least one cation binding site and, when said at least one cation binding site is occupied by a cation, at least one anion binding site. The invention also relates to the extraction of an anion from a liquid medium using the complexant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 45/00; C02F 1/68; C07D 323/00; G21F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 11/04 (2006.01); B01J 45/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/26 (2006.01); C02F 1/68 (2006.01); C07C 211/09 (2006.01); C07D 323/00 (2006.01); G21F 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 45/00 (2013.01); C02F 1/26 (2013.01); C02F 1/683 (2013.01); C07D 323/00 (2013.01); G21F 9/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054881A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054881 A1 20000921; AU 2933600 A 20001004; EP 1161299 A1 20011212; GB 9905867 D0 19990505; JP 2002539177 A 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR

2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI