Global Patent Index - EP 1161313 B1

EP 1161313 B1 2002-11-27 - CONTROL OF SURFACE EVENNESS FOR OBTAINING EVEN COLD STRIP

Title (en)

CONTROL OF SURFACE EVENNESS FOR OBTAINING EVEN COLD STRIP

Title (de)

PLANHEITSREGELUNG ZUR ERZIELUNG VON PLANEM KALTBAND

Title (fr)

REGLAGE DE PLANEITE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UNE BANDE A FROID PLANE

Publication

EP 1161313 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929223 A

Priority

  • DE 0000831 W
  • DE 19912796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054900A1] The invention relates to a method for rolling a strip in a strip rolling mill which has at least two roll stands or an individual stand with upper and lower, optionally adjustable working rolls respectively, said rolls being optionally supported indirectly on support rolls or with intermediate rolls. At least one pass is rolled in said rolls in order to modify the state of the rolled strip. A target distribution of stresses or any target form of unevenness is predetermined for the rolled strip and compared with the actual distribution of stresses and the mechanical or physical control elements are employed in such a way as to minimise the difference between the predetermined and actual distribution of stresses as far as possible. In addition to the actual distribution of stresses in the hot strip, the distribution of temperature over the width of the strip is determined and used to calculate the distribution of stresses which would be present after the strip has cooled if the strip were free of stresses in the hot state with the distribution of temperature that exists behind the roll gap and this temperature-induced distribution of stresses is used to correct the actual stress before this is compared with the target form of unevenness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/28 (2006.01); B21B 37/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/28 (2013.01); B21B 2261/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054900 A1 20000921; AT 228401 T 20021215; AU 4741600 A 20001004; BR 0009025 A 20011226; CN 1343146 A 20020403; DE 19912796 A1 20001012; EP 1161313 A1 20011212; EP 1161313 B1 20021127; ES 2182801 T3 20030316; JP 2003504206 A 20030204; TR 200102682 T2 20020422

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20031012

2004-04-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2004-03-03 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20031012

2004-03-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20031012

2004-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP A&D

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP A&D

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-08-22 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030822

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-08-18 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1161313E

2003-05-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-03-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182801 T3

2003-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-02-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000828 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228401 T 20021215

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI