Global Patent Index - EP 1161325 A1

EP 1161325 A1 2001-12-12 - ELECTRIC SHAVER

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SHAVER

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER RASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

RASOIR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1161325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01942337 A

Priority

  • AT 0100008 W
  • AT 162000 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151260A1] The invention relates to an electric shaver comprising a housing (1). An electric drive device (13) that is used for the oscillating movement of cutting knifes (11, 12) of a shaving head (2) is arranged in said housing. Said head (2) is provided with at least two engaging cutting elements which are driven in such a way that said elements can be displaced in relation to one another. A component (6) of the shaving head (2) is pivotally coupled around at least one axis (8) that is different in relation to the direction of the oscillating movement pertaining to the cutting knifes (11, 12) and extends in the direction of the longer axis pertaining to the housing, whereby said component carries at least one shearing blade (5) and is driven for performing a pivoting movement (9) around said axis (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/38 (2006.01); B26B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/048 (2013.01); B26B 19/288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151260 A1 20010719; AT 238890 T 20030515; CN 1166500 C 20040915; CN 1358128 A 20020710; DE 50100202 D1 20030605; EP 1161325 A1 20011212; EP 1161325 B1 20030502; HK 1047066 A1 20050429; JP 2003519553 A 20030624; JP 4653371 B2 20110316; US 2002157257 A1 20021031; US 6675480 B2 20040113

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100202

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100202

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121101

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1161325E

2003-10-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100202 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020112

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI