Global Patent Index - EP 1161328 B1

EP 1161328 B1 2002-11-27 - PAPER PUNCH

Title (en)

PAPER PUNCH

Title (de)

PAPIERLOCHER

Title (fr)

PERFORATEUR

Publication

EP 1161328 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903600 A

Priority

  • DE 19912043 A
  • EP 0000446 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912043A1] The invention relates to a paper punch with a pressure lever. The aim of the invention is to provide an especially simple paper punch that is easy to assemble. To this end, the pressure lever (24) comprises a U-shaped wire hoop. Said wire hoop (26) rests with a support point (32) that is arranged at the respective free ends of its hoop limbs (30) on one of the brackets (16). With its hoop limbs (30) it directly rests on a back surface (34) of the punching dies at a distance to the support point (32). The free space defined by the hoop web (28) and the two hoop limbs (30) can be spanned at least partially by a separate lid part (46) which preferably consists of plastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912043 A1 20000921; AT 228419 T 20021215; EP 1161328 A1 20011212; EP 1161328 B1 20021127; ES 2186625 T3 20030516; WO 0054943 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEITZ ACCO BRANDS GMBH & CO KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ESSELTE LEITZ GMBH & CO. KG, 70469 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 50000829

2018-02-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000829

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREGENZER UND REULE PARTNERSCHA, DE

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-09-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-08-25 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20170726

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-17 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000829

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREGENZER UND REULE PARTNERSCHA, DE

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120121

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228419 T

- Effective date: 20120121

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSELTE LEITZ G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-02 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1161328E

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186625 T3

2003-03-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-24 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2003-01-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-01-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000829 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228419 T 20021215

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANK, STEFAN

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RADU, BRIGITTE

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DECKER, MARTIN

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LABONDE, STEFAN

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFRUENDER, HORST

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEGHART, GERHARD

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFLUGFELDER, THEODOR

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUESTEL, REINER

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANK, STEFAN

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RADU, BRIGITTE

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DECKER, MARTIN

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LABONDE, STEFAN

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFRUENDER, HORST

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEGHART, GERHARD

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFLUGFELDER, THEODOR

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUESTEL, REINER

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE