Global Patent Index - EP 1161332 A1

EP 1161332 A1 2001-12-12 - IMPROVED METHOD OF MAKING MULTICELLULAR FILTERS

Title (en)

IMPROVED METHOD OF MAKING MULTICELLULAR FILTERS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VIELZELLIGER FILTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AMELIORE DE FABRICATION DE FILTRES MULTICELLULAIRES

Publication

EP 1161332 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904577 A

Priority

  • US 0001929 W
  • US 25079999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0048807A1] A method of plugging honeycomb cells (12) involves providing a honeycomb having an inlet end and an outlet end and a multiplicity of cells (12) extending from inlet end to outlet end, and introducing the sealant material (16) into pre-selected honeycomb cell openings by capillary action to form a plug on said pre-selected cell openings. The sealant can also be thermoplastic polymer preform having sections corresponding to the cell openings on a given surface of a honeycomb. The preform is positioned on the honeycomb surface having the pre-selected cell openings so that the perform is inserted into the pre-selected cell openings. The pre-selected cell openings are heated to allow the preform to deform into a thermoplastic sealing material and bond to inside walls of the pre-selected cell openings, to produce a plugged honeycomb with plugs securably positioned into the selected cell openings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/28; B29C 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/00 (2006.01); B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B29C 31/04 (2006.01); B29C 70/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 70/745 (2013.01); B01D 29/111 (2013.01); B01D 29/31 (2013.01); B29C 31/04 (2013.01); B01D 2201/46 (2013.01); B29L 2031/14 (2013.01); B29L 2031/608 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0048807 A1 20000824; EP 1161332 A1 20011212; EP 1161332 A4 20020807; JP 2002537100 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-03-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-08-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 1/28 A, 7B 29C 31/08 B, 7B 01D 39/20 B, 7C 04B 38/00 B

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE