Global Patent Index - EP 1161335 A1

EP 1161335 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED PARTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED PARTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FORMTEILEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES PIECES MOULEES

Publication

EP 1161335 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907533 A

Priority

  • DE 19911760 A
  • EP 0001053 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054959A1] The invention relates to a method for producing molded parts from interlocking fastening elements (10) which consist of a thermodeformable plastic material. The respective interlocking fastening element (10) is heated at least to its molding temperature and is then brought into the defined shape by way of at least one molding tool (12). The invention provides a method for producing molded parts in the form of interlocking fastening elements that affords geometries of the interlocking fastening elements that can be produced at low costs and that can be immediately used for a large number of applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 51/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 51/08 (2006.01); B29C 35/08 (2006.01); B29C 51/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 51/08 (2013.01); B29C 51/10 (2013.01); B29C 2035/0822 (2013.01); B29C 2791/006 (2013.01); B29K 2023/12 (2013.01); B29L 2031/729 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054959A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054959 A1 20000921; EP 1161335 A1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOTTLIEB BINDER GMBH & CO.

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOTTLIEB BINDER GMBH & CO.

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK WIESMAYER GMBH

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE