Global Patent Index - EP 1161345 A1

EP 1161345 A1 2001-12-12 - PRINTING UNIT OF A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (en)

PRINTING UNIT OF A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (de)

DRUCKWERK EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

GROUPE D'IMPRESSION D'UNE PRESSE D'IMPRIMERIE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 1161345 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916798 A

Priority

  • DE 0000686 W
  • DE 19911180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911180A1] The invention relates to a printing unit for a rotary printing press. According to the invention, intermediate support rings are provided on the cylinder, roller or spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/21; B41F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/08 (2006.01); B41F 13/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 13/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/21 (2013.01); B41P 2227/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054970A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911180 A1 20000921; DE 19911180 C2 20010201; EP 1161345 A1 20011212; EP 1161345 B1 20020814; JP 2002538998 A 20021119; JP 3803553 B2 20060802; US 6782816 B1 20040831; WO 0054970 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000379

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1161345E

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000379 20020919

2002-09-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE