Global Patent Index - EP 1161346 A1

EP 1161346 A1 2001-12-12 - PRINTING DEVICE WITH MEANS FOR CONVEYING PAPER

Title (en)

PRINTING DEVICE WITH MEANS FOR CONVEYING PAPER

Title (de)

DRUCKVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM PAPIERTRANSPORT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION AVEC TRANSPORT DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1161346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920377 A

Priority

  • DE 0000766 W
  • DE 19912255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056551A1] A printing device (10) comprises a lower part (12) and an upper part (14) that is mounted on said lower part (14) in such a way that it can swivel about a swivel pin (16). A print head (18) and a receiving trough (62) for a recording medium supply roll (64) are located in the lower part (12) and a conveying device (24, 30) for a recording medium (66) and a print backing support (36) that is spatially associated with the print head (18) are located in the upper part (14). The upper part (14) has two side walls (42), which laterally enclose a recording medium supply roll (64) that is placed into the receiving trough (62). The invention is characterised in that the print backing support (36) is level in the printing area (70) of the print head (18), in that the conveying device comprises a pair of conveyor rollers (24) that are oriented parallel to the print backing support (36) and are driven by a motor and a tightening device (30) for the recording medium (66), and in that the swivel pin (16) is situated beneath the print backing support (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 15/04; B41J 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 11/02 (2006.01); B41J 11/08 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/08 (2013.01); B41J 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056551A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056551 A1 20000928; EP 1161346 A1 20011212; EP 1161346 B1 20030611; JP 2002539975 A 20021126; US 6637959 B1 20031028

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002534

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090311

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002534 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE