Global Patent Index - EP 1161348 A1

EP 1161348 A1 2001-12-12 - MARKING FILM AND COMPOSITE MARKING FILM

Title (en)

MARKING FILM AND COMPOSITE MARKING FILM

Title (de)

MARKIERUNGSFOLIE UND VERBUNDMARKIERUNGSFOLIE

Title (fr)

FILM DE MARQUAGE ET FILM DE MARQUAGE COMPOSITE

Publication

EP 1161348 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00913576 A

Priority

  • JP 6713899 A
  • US 0004567 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054980A1] A marking film exhibiting good ability for tracing curved surfaces when it is to be stuck to steeply curved three-dimensional portions without entrapping air bubbles at the film edges when an over-clear coating is applied thereon after it has been stuck. The marking film has a marking component to be transferred onto an article via an adhesive layer, wherein the total thickness of the marking film is in the range of from about 50 mu m to about 300 mu m, and the modulus of elasticity thereof is in the range of from about 2 kgf/mm<2> to about 25 kgf/mm<2> as measured under a condition where the marking film is elongated at a tension speed of 300 mm/min. into an elongation percentage in the range of 0 to about 10 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 3/12; B44C 1/10; B44C 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 7/02 (2006.01); B41M 3/12 (2006.01); C09J 121/00 (2006.01); C09J 133/00 (2006.01); C09J 201/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/12 (2013.01); B41M 5/41 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054980A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054980 A1 20000921; AU 3499700 A 20001004; DE 60022990 D1 20060216; EP 1161348 A1 20011212; EP 1161348 B1 20051005; JP 2000265123 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080222

2007-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022990 P 20060216

2006-01-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060106

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORI, YUTAKA

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010825

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI