Global Patent Index - EP 1161368 A1

EP 1161368 A1 2001-12-12 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WATER SOLUBLE PACKAGE

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WATER SOLUBLE PACKAGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EMBALLAGE HYDROSOLUBLE

Publication

EP 1161368 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00907646 A

Priority

  • EP 0001647 W
  • GB 9906179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055044A1] A process for producing a thermoformed package comprises the steps of placing a first sheet of film over a forming die having at least one cavity; heating the film to mould the film into the at least one cavity thereby forming at least one recess in the film, placing a composition in the at least one formed recess and sealing a second sheet of film across the at least one formed recess to produce at least one closed package. Each cavity includes a curved edge at least a portion of which comprises a resiliently deformable material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055044A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055044 A1 20000921; AT 226905 T 20021115; AU 2916100 A 20001004; BR 0009048 A 20020115; CA 2360805 A1 20000921; CN 1344210 A 20020410; CZ 20013334 A3 20020313; DE 60000684 D1 20021205; DE 60000684 T2 20030612; EP 1161368 A1 20011212; EP 1161368 B1 20021030; ES 2184696 T3 20030416; GB 9906179 D0 19990512; RO 118861 B1 20031230; TR 200102518 T2 20020121; ZA 200105054 B 20020620

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184696 T3

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000684 20021205

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226905 T 20021115

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE