Global Patent Index - EP 1161375 A1

EP 1161375 A1 2001-12-12 - CUMULATIVE PACKAGING PROVIDED FOR THE REMOVAL OF FILLED POUCHES IN A PREDETERMINED ORDER

Title (en)

CUMULATIVE PACKAGING PROVIDED FOR THE REMOVAL OF FILLED POUCHES IN A PREDETERMINED ORDER

Title (de)

SAMMELPACKUNG ZUR ENTNAHME VON BEFÜLLTEN BEUTELN IN VORGEGEBENER REIHENFOLGE

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE COLLECTEUR POUR PRELEVER DES SACHETS REMPLIS, SELON UN ORDRE PREDETERMINE

Publication

EP 1161375 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912571 A

Priority

  • DE 19911799 A
  • EP 0002043 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911799A1] The invention relates to a packaging of products which are additionally packed in a pouch (2) in order to protect the same, whereby the packaging is comprised of at least two pouches. The products placed in these pouches can be identical or different. These products are to be preferably removed and used in a predetermined order.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 67/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01); B65D 33/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055061A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911799 A1 20000928; AT 249976 T 20031015; AU 3428300 A 20001004; DK 1161375 T3 20031215; EP 1161375 A1 20011212; EP 1161375 B1 20030917; ES 2207491 T3 20040601; JP 2002539050 A 20021119; JP 4494646 B2 20100630; US 2004232028 A1 20041125; US 6905705 B2 20050614; US 7004321 B1 20060228; WO 0055061 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130309

2014-01-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130331

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207491 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030917

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031226

2003-12-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-15 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-11-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003727 P 20031023

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI