Global Patent Index - EP 1161394 A1

EP 1161394 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALIGNING INDIVIDUAL SHEETS IN A SHEET PROCESSING MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALIGNING INDIVIDUAL SHEETS IN A SHEET PROCESSING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSRICHTUNG VON EINZELBLÄTTERN IN EINEM BLATTVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ALIGNER UNE FEUILLE DANS UNE MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE FEUILLES

Publication

EP 1161394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920509 A

Priority

  • DE 19912234 A
  • EP 0002374 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056643A1] The invention relates to a device for aligning a sheet-type recording medium (2) in a sheet processing machine (11). Said device is provided with a conveyor path (6) across which said recording medium (2) is transported from an input position (at 3a) to an output position (at 3b) in a direction of conveyance (A). A stop (1) is provided towards which the recording medium (2) is moved during conveyance in a transversal direction to the direction of conveyance (A) in order to align said recording medium. The device also encompasses a conveyor device (4, 5, 9) which moves the part (26a) of the stop-facing edge (26) of the recording medium (2) that is in the rear position with regard to the direction of conveyance towards the stop (1) before moving its front part (26b) towards the stop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056643A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056643 A1 20000928; EP 1161394 A1 20011212; EP 1161394 B1 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004422

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004422 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE