Global Patent Index - EP 1161396 A1

EP 1161396 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING A YARN BOBBIN

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING A YARN BOBBIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WICKELN EINER FADENSPULE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE BOBINAGE D'UNE BOBINE DE FIL

Publication

EP 1161396 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01909582 A

Priority

  • DE 10001085 A
  • EP 0100104 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151396A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for winding a yarn bobbin (6). According to said method, an in-running thread (1) is guided back and forth using a traversing thread guide (3) within a traversing stroke and is deposited on the yarn bobbin (6). To avoid the formation of high ridges on the bobbin, the traversing stroke of the traversing thread guide can be modified in length within the breadth of the yarn bobbin, during the winding process. The modifications to the length of the traversing stroke take place during the travel of the bobbin according to a predetermined respiration function (Z). According to the invention, the respiration function (Z) is determined from a mass distribution (F) of the thread on a theoretically wound, ideal yarn bobbin in such a way that a predetermined bobbin density of the yarn bobbin can be created.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2821 (2013.01); B65H 54/38 (2013.01); B65H 54/385 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151396A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151396 A1 20010719; AU 3727801 A 20010724; CN 1263670 C 20060712; CN 1358155 A 20020710; EP 1161396 A1 20011212; EP 1161396 B1 20030820; TR 200301809 T4 20040121; TW 512124 B 20021201; US 2002033428 A1 20020321; US 7163174 B2 20070116

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080108

2011-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100927

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080108

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080108

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080108

2008-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20070108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100508 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI TR

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI