Global Patent Index - EP 1161397 A1

EP 1161397 A1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING AND CUTTING A TAPERING THREAD WHEN CHANGING BOBBINS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING AND CUTTING A TAPERING THREAD WHEN CHANGING BOBBINS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÜHREN UND SCHNEIDEN EINES ZULAUFENDEN FADENS BEIM SPULENWECHSEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR GUIDER ET COUPER UN FIL D'ALIMENTATION LORS DU CHANGEMENT DE BOBINES

Publication

EP 1161397 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912574 A

Priority

  • DE 19911264 A
  • EP 0002060 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055084A1] The invention relates to a device and method for guiding and cutting a continuously tapering thread (1) when changing bobbins in a winding device. To this end, the thread is guided essentially parallel to a bobbin or to a tube (13) by means of a moveable thread guide (18), said bobbin or tube being driven by a slubbing roller (29). A deflecting device (2) and a suction device (37) are arranged downstream from the thread guide (18), said suction device being comprised of a pneumatic suction connection (46) and of a cutting device (47). The suction device (37) interacts with a transferring device in order to cut the thread when changing bobbins and in order to take up the free thread end of the tapering thread. In order to enable a gentle processing of the thread when changing bobbins, the thread guide (18) is arranged, in the flow of the thread, in front of the driven tube (13), and the deflecting device (2) as well as the suction device (37) are arranged behind said driven tube. In order to catch and wind the thread onto a new tube (13) which is driven by a slubbing roller (29), the thread is guided by the deflecting device (2) and by the thread guide (18) outside of the contact area between the tube (13) and the slubbing roller (29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04; B65H 54/34; B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055084A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055084 A1 20000921; CN 1162315 C 20040818; CN 1343178 A 20020403; EP 1161397 A1 20011212; EP 1161397 B1 20030820; JP 2002539058 A 20021119; JP 4709391 B2 20110622; US 2002033429 A1 20020321; US 6457668 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100309

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003358 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE