Global Patent Index - EP 1161399 A1

EP 1161399 A1 2001-12-12 - FORM TOOL, METHOD AND CLOSURE FOR CLOSING CONTAINERS

Title (en)

FORM TOOL, METHOD AND CLOSURE FOR CLOSING CONTAINERS

Title (de)

FORMWERKZEUG, VERFAHREN UND VERSCHLUSS ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN VON BEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE FORMAGE, PROCEDE ET FERMETURE POUR FERMER DES CONTENANTS

Publication

EP 1161399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907549 A

Priority

  • DE 19910443 A
  • EP 0001122 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910443A1] The invention relates to a form tool for closing containers, more particularly bottles, comprising closures (37) having a closure crown (45) and a jacket (47) starting therefrom, made of deep-drawable material, preferably aluminum sheet or steel sheet, and a sleeve (3) covering the closure (37) during a closing operation, said sleeve having a drawing tool (31) with a deep-drawn section (23) that engages from the outside with the transition area (41) between the closure crown (45) and the sleeve (47) of the closure (37) during closing and that subjects the transition area (41) to a deep-drawing process. The form tool is characterized in that the drawing tool (31) of the sleeve (3) has a formed section (27) contacting the transition area (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053523A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910443 A1 20000914; AT 252515 T 20031115; AU 2910200 A 20000928; EP 1161399 A1 20011212; EP 1161399 B1 20031022; ES 2208283 T3 20040616; PL 193103 B1 20070131; PL 351494 A1 20030422; WO 0053523 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208283 T3

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031022

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI