Global Patent Index - EP 1161453 A1

EP 1161453 A1 2001-12-12 - CYTOKINE-BINDING DOMAIN

Title (en)

CYTOKINE-BINDING DOMAIN

Title (de)

CYTOKIN-BINDENDE DOMÄNE

Title (fr)

DOMAINE DE FIXATION LA CYTOKINE

Publication

EP 1161453 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904705 A

Priority

  • AU 0000079 W
  • AU PP857699 A
  • AU PP857799 A
  • AU PP026499 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/715; A61K 39/395; C07K 16/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161453 A1 20011212; EP 1161453 A4 20050105

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140129

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-01-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041124

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDVET SCIENCE PTY. LTD.

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI