Global Patent Index - EP 1161457 A1

EP 1161457 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING RESISTANT STARCH

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING RESISTANT STARCH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG RESISTENTER STÄRKE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'AMIDON RESISTANT

Publication

EP 1161457 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912581 A

Priority

  • DE 19911001 A
  • EP 0002081 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911001A1] The invention relates to a method for producing resistant starch, resistant starch obtained using this method, and to the use thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08B 30/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 29/212 (2016.01); A23L 29/30 (2016.01); C08B 30/12 (2006.01); C08B 30/14 (2006.01); C12P 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 19/04 (2013.01); A23L 29/212 (2016.08); A23L 29/35 (2016.08); C08B 30/12 (2013.01); C08B 30/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055209A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911001 A1 20000921; DE 19911001 C2 20020620; AU 3428600 A 20001004; AU 766960 B2 20031030; CA 2365462 A1 20000921; CN 1139601 C 20040225; CN 1352652 A 20020605; EP 1161457 A1 20011212; US 2003054501 A1 20030320; US 6623943 B2 20030923; WO 0055209 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040607

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIEDL, DETLEF

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOENIG, BAERBEL, JOHANNA

2002-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOBASCH, GISELA

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIEDL, DETLEF

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOENIG, BAERBEL, JOHANNA

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOBASCH, GISELA

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI