Global Patent Index - EP 1161493 A1

EP 1161493 A1 2001-12-12 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING NBR AND THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER

Title (en)

COMPOSITION CONTAINING NBR AND THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER

Title (de)

NBR ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND THERMISCHES ELASTOMER

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION CONTENANT NBR ET ELASTOMERES THERMOPLASTIQUES

Publication

EP 1161493 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00940084 A

Priority

  • BR 0000073 W
  • BR 9902743 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0104208A1] The present invention relates to an NBR copolymer and thermoplastic elastomer composition. The invention further relates to a pre-crosslinked NBR copolymer and thermoplastic elastomer composition, in which the NBR is pre-cosslinked by addition to the composition of a crosslinking monomer having a functionality equal or higher than 3, said crosslinking monomer being selected from divinyl benzene, trimethylol propane trimethacrylate, ethylene glycol dimethacrylate and triallyl isocianate. Said compositions are specially useful for shoes industry, toys, coifs, gaskets and any other article made of rubber. Said rubber produced according to the present invention exhibits improved mechanical, chemical and dull look properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 9/02 (2006.01); C08L 53/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 9/02 (2013.01); C08L 53/02 (2013.01); C08L 53/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 9/02 + C08L 2666/24
  2. C08L 53/02 + C08L 2666/08
  3. C08L 53/02 + C08L 2666/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0104208 A1 20010118; BR 9902743 A 20010306; BR 9902743 C1 20010522; EP 1161493 A1 20011212; EP 1161493 A4 20040623

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-06-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE