Global Patent Index - EP 1161519 A1

EP 1161519 A1 2001-12-12 - DENTIFRICES COMPRISING SURFACTANT GRANULATES

Title (en)

DENTIFRICES COMPRISING SURFACTANT GRANULATES

Title (de)

ZAHNPASTEN ENTHALTEND TENSIDGRANULATE

Title (fr)

DENTIFRICES COMPRENANT DES GRANULATS DE TENSIOACTIF

Publication

EP 1161519 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00914104 A

Priority

  • DE 19911040 A
  • EP 0001836 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911040A1] The invention relates to surfactant granulates which are obtained by subjecting mono-glyceride (ether) sulfates which contain 20 to 60 percent by weight aqueous paste to drying and simultaneous granulation in a fluidised bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; A61K 7/16; A61K 7/24; C11D 1/28; C11D 1/37; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/21 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61Q 11/00 (2006.01); B01J 2/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/16 (2006.01); C11D 1/28 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 11/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/0225 (2013.01); A61K 8/463 (2013.01); C11D 1/16 (2013.01); C11D 1/28 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 1/123 (2013.01); C11D 1/14 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055293A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911040 A1 20000921; EP 1161519 A1 20011212; JP 2003524678 A 20030819; US 6656454 B1 20031202; WO 0055293 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-07-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DENTIFRICES COMPRISING SURFACTANT GRANULATES

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE