Global Patent Index - EP 1161523 A1

EP 1161523 A1 2001-12-12 - CELLS, CELL POPULATIONS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME

Title (en)

CELLS, CELL POPULATIONS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME

Title (de)

ZELLEN, ZELLPOPULATIONEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

CELLULES, POPULATIONS CELLULAIRES, ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1161523 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00916410 A

Priority

  • US 0006940 W
  • US 12488999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055306A1] The present invention generally relates to stem cells, including progenitor and precursor cells, which are preferably immortalized, and have been derived from the central nervous system (CNS); methods for treating a host by implanting the disclosed cells, and genetically altered forms of the disclosed cells in the host, and methods for making same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 35/30 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); C12N 5/0797 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0623 (2013.01); C12N 7/00 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); C12N 2510/00 (2013.01); C12N 2510/04 (2013.01); C12N 2710/22051 (2013.01); Y02A 50/471 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055306 A1 20000921; AU 3751800 A 20001004; EP 1161523 A1 20011212; EP 1161523 A4 20030402; JP 2003524396 A 20030819

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1040091

2007-09-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070810

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-04-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELLSTAT BIOLOGICS CORPORATION

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, A

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRO-VIRUS, INC.

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, A

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010917;LT PAYMENT 20010917;LV PAYMENT 20010917;MK PAYMENT 20010917;RO PAYMENT 20010917;SI PAYMENT 20010917