Global Patent Index - EP 1161568 B1

EP 1161568 B1 2002-09-25 - Use of a Tube

Title (en)

Use of a Tube

Title (de)

Verwendung eines Rohres

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un tuyau

Publication

EP 1161568 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902633 A

Priority

  • DE 19906082 A
  • EP 0000582 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906082A1] The invention relates to a tube and to the use thereof. The aim of the invention is to provide a more economical manner of producing tubes of the kind used, for example, in vehicle manufacture for building vehicle frameworks. To this end the invention provides for the use of a tube consisting of steel having the following composition (in % by weight): carbon: between 0.12 and 0.16; silicium: </= 0.03; manganese: between 0.65 and 1.2; phosphorus: </= 0.025; sulfur: </= 0.008; aluminium: > 0.020; boron </= 0.0008.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/04; C22C 38/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); F16L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906082 A1 20000831; DE 19906082 C2 20030410; EP 1161568 A1 20011212; EP 1161568 B1 20020925; HU 0200272 A2 20020529; HU 226278 B1 20080728; TR 200102348 T2 20020121; WO 0047790 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160126

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160127

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000564

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1161568E

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000564 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A TUBE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE