Global Patent Index - EP 1161571 A1

EP 1161571 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR MACHINING A COMPONENT SURFACE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MACHINING A COMPONENT SURFACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINES BAUTEILS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'USINER LA SURFACE D'UNE PIECE

Publication

EP 1161571 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903632 A

Priority

  • DE 19907102 A
  • DE 19941564 A
  • EP 0000572 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049195A1] The invention relates to a method for machining the surface of a component by means of a particle stream produced by thermal spraying. According to the invention the particle stream scans the surface of the component to be machined at least partly in accordance with a defined pattern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/12; C23C 4/06; C23C 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 4/01 (2016.01); C23C 4/12 (2013.01); C23C 4/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049195 A1 20000824; CN 1192123 C 20050309; CN 1340111 A 20020313; EP 1161571 A1 20011212; EP 1161571 B1 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-12 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070507

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006820 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE