Global Patent Index - EP 1161580 A1

EP 1161580 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR FEEDING IN AND STARTING A THREAD AND FALSE TWIST TEXTURING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FEEDING IN AND STARTING A THREAD AND FALSE TWIST TEXTURING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÜHREN UND ANLEGEN VON GARN UND FALSCHDRALLTEXTURIEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INSERTION ET D'ETALEMENT DE FIL, ET DISPOSITIF DE TEXTURATION PAR FAUSSE TORSION

Publication

EP 1161580 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912468 A

Priority

  • DE 19906325 A
  • DE 19909380 A
  • EP 0001264 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6735934B1] A process and device for texturing a thread within a false twist texturing device with a heat exchanger having thread passages formed by thread passage segments. The heat exchanger possesses a first section and a second section which form a chamber into which a fluid can flow to treat a thread during operation of the heat exchanger. The first and second sections of the heat exchanger can be manipulated to enlarge the thread passages to facilitate insertion of the thread. After the thread insertion, the heat exchanger is sealable in such a manner that the thread passages seal around the thread to prevent leakage of the fluid from the chamber while allowing the thread to be movable through the heat exchanger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 13/00; B65H 51/16; D02G 1/02; D02J 1/08; D06B 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/04 (2006.01); D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01); D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/0273 (2013.01); D02G 1/161 (2013.01); D02J 1/08 (2013.01); D02J 13/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049212A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6735934 B1 20040518; AU 3422700 A 20000904; CN 1323202 C 20070627; CN 1340114 A 20020313; EP 1161580 A1 20011212; EP 1161580 B1 20040714; JP 2002537494 A 20021105; WO 0049212 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080216

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080216

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080216

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010721

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI