Global Patent Index - EP 1161587 A1

EP 1161587 A1 2001-12-12 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WATER-SOLUBLE PACKAGE

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WATER-SOLUBLE PACKAGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION D'EMBALLAGES SOLUBLES DANS L'EAU

Publication

EP 1161587 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00914113 A

Priority

  • EP 0001942 W
  • GB 9906172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055415A1] A process for producing a thermoformed package comprises the steps of placing a first sheet of film over a forming die having at least one cavity, heating the film to mould the film into the at least one cavity thereby forming at least one recess in the film, placing a composition in the at least one formed recess, and sealing a second sheet of film across the at least one formed recess to produce at least one closed package. Each cavity is cooled to between 2 and 10 degrees C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02; B65D 65/46; C11D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/46 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/042 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055415A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055415 A1 20000921; AT 231936 T 20030215; AU 3554200 A 20001004; BR 0009045 A 20020108; CA 2365987 A1 20000921; CN 1344341 A 20020410; CZ 20013337 A3 20020213; DE 60001308 D1 20030306; DE 60001308 T2 20031016; EP 1161587 A1 20011212; EP 1161587 B1 20030129; ES 2190407 T3 20030801; GB 9906172 D0 19990512; TR 200102643 T2 20020422; ZA 200107198 B 20020830

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20091010

2009-12-23 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20091010

2009-12-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20091010

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20031024

2009-04-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20031028

2008-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

2008-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20031024

2008-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20031028

2008-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2008-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

2008-02-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20031024

2008-02-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20031028

2007-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2007-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

2007-03-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20031024

2007-03-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20031028

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20031024

2004-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190407 T3

2003-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-03-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-03-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60001308 P 20030306

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI