Global Patent Index - EP 1161595 A1

EP 1161595 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING AND/OR IMPROVING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A MACHINE FOR PRODUCING AND/OR IMPROVING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND/ODER VEREDELUNG VON MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACTIONNER UNE MACHINE POUR LA PRODUCTION ET/OU L'AMELIORATION DES BANDES DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1161595 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910822 A

Priority

  • DE 19911394 A
  • EP 0002198 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911394A1] The invention relates to a method for operating a machine for producing and/or improving material webs, especially paper webs. Process data is detected in the area of at least one section of the machine, especially the drier section (10) of a paper machine, using at least one measurable variable relating to the production process. Said data is evaluated in a combined manner in several measuring ranges (12) which are arranged in tandem in the direction of the process (P). The invention also relates to a measuring unit for carrying out such a method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; F26B 13/10; F26B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 25/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0009 (2013.01); F26B 13/10 (2013.01); F26B 25/22 (2013.01); Y10S 162/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055421A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911394 A1 20000921; DE 50015829 D1 20100204; EP 1161595 A1 20011212; EP 1161595 B1 20091223; US 6712937 B1 20040330; WO 0055421 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015829

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120313

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100924

2010-04-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-02-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015829 P 20100204

2009-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE