Global Patent Index - EP 1161596 A1

EP 1161596 A1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN VON EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER LAUFENDEN MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER LES PROPRIETES D'UNE BANDE CONTINUE DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1161596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916942 A

Priority

  • DE 19911395 A
  • EP 0002250 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911395A1] The invention relates to a device for determining the characteristics of a running material web and/or a machine for the production and/or improvement thereof. The inventive device is especially used in paper machines and preferably in the drier section of paper machines. Said device comprises at least one measuring device that is provided with at least two degrees of freedom of motion for detecting data at several measuring points, said data relating to at least one measurable variable, whereby the degrees of freedom of motion correspond to a rotation or linear movement respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 7/06 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/06 (2013.01); D21F 5/04 (2013.01); D21G 9/0009 (2013.01); G01N 33/346 (2013.01); Y10S 162/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055422A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911395 A1 20000921; EP 1161596 A1 20011212; US 6773551 B1 20040810; WO 0055422 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061006

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE