Global Patent Index - EP 1161600 A1

EP 1161600 A1 2001-12-12 - SANITARY APPLIANCE AND INSTALLATION METHOD

Title (en)

SANITARY APPLIANCE AND INSTALLATION METHOD

Title (de)

SANITÄRARMATUR UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ROBINETTERIE SANITAIRE ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE

Publication

EP 1161600 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912569 A

Priority

  • DE 19911066 A
  • EP 0002033 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911066A1] The invention relates to a sanitary appliance which is constructed in such a way that a cartridge housing (12) is manufactured as a simple and inexpensive part for a, in particular, commercial mixer cartridge (16). The cartridge (16) is fixed exclusively inside the cartridge housing (12). Afterwards, the cartridge housing (12), together with the cartridge (16), is inserted as a modular unit inside the appliance housing (1). The appliance housing (1) can be constructed more easily since, with the exception of the opening for inserting the cartridge housing (12), it does not have to contain any additional devices used to fix said cartridge housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04; F16K 11/00; F16K 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911066 A1 20000914; EP 1161600 A1 20011212; EP 1161600 B1 20040218; WO 0055436 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005329

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HANSGROHE SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANSGROHE AG, 77761 SCHILTACH, DE

- Document: DE 50005329

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005329

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005329

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040529

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005329 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-06-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SANITARY APPLIANCE AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLY

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011004