Global Patent Index - EP 1161624 A1

EP 1161624 A1 2001-12-12 - MULTI-PIECE PISTON

Title (en)

MULTI-PIECE PISTON

Title (de)

GEBAUTER KOLBEN

Title (fr)

PISTON EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES

Publication

EP 1161624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907440 A

Priority

  • DE 0000199 W
  • DE 19910582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053913A1] The invention relates to a multi-piece piston, comprising a steel upper part and a lower part which is screwed to said upper part and which contains the hubs. The aim of the invention is to improve the strength of the lower part and its resistance to material defects and to reduce production costs. To this end, the lower part consists of a precipitation-hardened ferrite-perlite steel, preferably according to DIN EN 10267 and with added titanium and the hubs of the lower part are preferably not reinforced with bushings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/22 (2006.01); F16J 1/01 (2006.01); F16J 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/0023 (2013.01); F02F 3/003 (2013.01); F02F 3/22 (2013.01); F02F 2200/04 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053913A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053913 A1 20000914; BR 0008833 A 20011218; BR 0008833 B1 20090113; DE 10080565 D2 20020307; DE 19910582 A1 20000928; DE 20007415 U1 20000928; EP 1161624 A1 20011212; EP 1161624 B1 20030528; JP 2002539356 A 20021119; US 6622613 B1 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-29 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080610

2008-10-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080610

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002358 P 20030703

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE