Global Patent Index - EP 1161629 A1

EP 1161629 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD FOR DRIVING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE IN A VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND STARTER UNIT FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION THEREOF

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DRIVING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE IN A VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND STARTER UNIT FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION THEREOF

Title (de)

ANLASSVERFAHREN FÜR DEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES UND ANLASSVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE DE VEHICULE, NOTAMMENT AUTOMOBILE, ET ENSEMBLE FORMANT DEMARREUR POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 1161629 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01903902 A

Priority

  • FR 0100061 W
  • FR 0000334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2803633A1] A method for driving an internal combustion engine in a vehicle, especially a motor vehicle, by means of a starter unit. Said starter unit drives the internal combustion engine according to at least two successive modes corresponding to various characteristic speed/ torque curves. A first mode enables high torque for low speeds. A second mode enables speeds which are higher than the first mode for lower torques. The first mode has a characteristic curve with a higher drive speed than when the characteristic curve of the second mode is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2013.01); F02D 2400/18 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 2200/022 (2013.01); F02N 2200/045 (2013.01); F02N 2200/063 (2013.01); F02N 2300/102 (2013.01); F02N 2300/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151807A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2803633 A1 20010713; FR 2803633 B1 20020719; DE 60109089 D1 20050407; DE 60109089 T2 20060413; EP 1161629 A1 20011212; EP 1161629 B1 20050302; ES 2239120 T3 20050916; WO 0151807 A1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130110

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239120 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60109089 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR