Global Patent Index - EP 1161669 A1

EP 1161669 A1 2001-12-12 - DECONVOLVING FAR-FIELD IMAGES USING SCANNED PROBE DATA

Title (en)

DECONVOLVING FAR-FIELD IMAGES USING SCANNED PROBE DATA

Title (de)

ENTFALTEN VON FERN-FELD-BILDERN MIT HILFE VON ZEILENABGETASTETEN SONDENDATEN

Title (fr)

DECONVOLUTION D'IMAGES A CHAMP LOINTAIN AU MOYEN DE DONNEES DE SONDE SCANNEES

Publication

EP 1161669 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00907321 A

Priority

  • IL 12851999 A
  • US 0040002 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0047978A1] A method for deconvolving far-field optical images beyond the diffraction limit includes the use of near-field optical and other scanned probe imaging data to provide powerful and new constraints for the deconvolution of far-field data sets. Near-field data, such as that which can be obtained from atomic force microscopy on a region of the far-field data set in an integrated and inter-digitate way, is used to produce resolutions beyond the diffraction limit of the lens that is being used. In the case of non-linear optical imaging or other microscopies, resolutions beyond that which is achievable with these microscopies can be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01Q 30/02 (2010.01); G01Q 30/04 (2010.01); G01Q 60/18 (2010.01); G01Q 60/24 (2010.01); G02B 21/00 (2006.01); G02B 21/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01Q 40/00 (2013.01); G01Q 30/04 (2013.01); G02B 21/002 (2013.01); G02B 21/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0047978 A1 20000817; EP 1161669 A1 20011212; EP 1161669 A4 20061220; IL 128519 D0 20000601; JP 2002536696 A 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100311

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-12-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061120

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 13/14 20060101AFI20000821BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 21/36 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE