Global Patent Index - EP 1161678 A1

EP 1161678 A1 2001-12-12 - HYBRID FILM TYPE SENSOR

Title (en)

HYBRID FILM TYPE SENSOR

Title (de)

SENSOR VOM HYBRIDSCHICHTTYP

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR DE TYPE FILM HYBRIDE

Publication

EP 1161678 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00978779 A

Priority

  • US 0031660 W
  • US 44433499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136956A1] A miniaturized gas sensor comprises a thick-or-thin type electrodes, on a non-conductive supportive susbtrate (1), and in contact with a solid ionomer electrolyte (8), for the detection of toxic gases, i.e., carbon monoxide, and other oxidizable or reducible gases and vapors is described. The all-solid planar sensor cell has two or more film type electrodes (4, 5, 7) arranged on a non-conductive planar surface of a supportive substrate. The electrodes are discret and in intimate contact with the same solid polymer ionomer membrane. The sensor cell contains no liquid electrolyte and is operated in a constant-voltage, potentiostatic or potentiodynamic mode. A high sensitivity to a select gas or vapor is achieved by a novel three-phase contact area design for a sensing electrode which provides contact with the solid ionomer electrolyte, as well as the gas sample via diffusion openings or holes (2) that penetrate through the supportive substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/407

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/30 (2006.01); G01N 27/407 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 27/49 (2006.01); G01N 33/00 (2006.01); G01N 27/333 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/4074 (2013.01); G01N 27/3335 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136956 A1 20010525; WO 0136956 A9 20020523; AU 1620401 A 20010530; CA 2360595 A1 20010525; CA 2360595 C 20060207; CN 1195980 C 20050406; CN 1347495 A 20020501; EP 1161678 A1 20011212; EP 1161678 A4 20070221; JP 2003515131 A 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2007-02-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070118

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI