Global Patent Index - EP 1161706 A1

EP 1161706 A1 2001-12-12 - ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLABLE LIQUID CRYSTAL MICROSTRUCTURES

Title (en)

ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLABLE LIQUID CRYSTAL MICROSTRUCTURES

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCH STEUERBARE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLMIKROSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

MICROSTRUCTURES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ELECTRIQUEMENT REGLABLES

Publication

EP 1161706 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00914593 A

Priority

  • US 0003866 W
  • US 12050599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049452A1] This invention relates to methods of building rigid or flexible arrays of electro-optic devices. A phase separated composite structure technique yields adjacent regions of polymer and liquid crystal (LC) of specific architecture instead of a random dispersion of LC droplets. The above devices can be prepared by producing volumes of LC structure (56) next to a polymer area (58) using anisotropic phase separation of LC from a photopolymer, initial by UV exposure. The shape, size and placement of these regions inside a cell becomes easily controllable with using optical mask or laser beam. The boundaries of LC volume can be controlled by controlling the chemical composition of the polymer and using an alignment layer (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1333; G02F 1/1334

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 3/00 (2006.01); G02B 5/18 (2006.01); G02F 1/1334 (2006.01); G02F 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/1828 (2013.01); G02B 3/0006 (2013.01); G02B 3/0081 (2013.01); G02F 1/1334 (2013.01); G02F 1/29 (2013.01); G02B 3/0056 (2013.01); G02F 2001/294 (2013.01); G02F 2203/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049452 A1 20000824; AU 3596300 A 20000904; EP 1161706 A1 20011212; EP 1161706 A4 20040707; JP 2002537580 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2004-07-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02F 1/1333 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02F 1/1334 B

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI