Global Patent Index - EP 1161757 A1

EP 1161757 A1 2001-12-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESENCE OF A METAL SEALING JOINT IN AN ELECTRIC TRANSMISSION LINE CONNECTION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESENCE OF A METAL SEALING JOINT IN AN ELECTRIC TRANSMISSION LINE CONNECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN EINER KONTAKTVERBINDUNG IN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN LEITUNG AUF DAS VORHANDENSEIN EINER METALLDICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE LA PRESENCE D'UN JOINT D'ETANCHEITE METALLIQUE DANS UNE CONNEXION D'UNE LIGNE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1161757 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00905131 A

Priority

  • FR 0000361 W
  • FR 9903235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791170A1] The invention concerns a method which consists in: providing around the electric transmission line connection a coil (20); powering the coil with alternating current; moving the coil; measuring the coil impedance and comparing the measured impedance to a reference impedance, The coil (20) is preferably interrupted by a slot (21) for engaging the coil (20) around the cable linked to a connector of the connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21C 17/00 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/201 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/202 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/30 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055865A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791170 A1 20000922; FR 2791170 B1 20010622; CN 1152385 C 20040602; CN 1343362 A 20020403; EP 1161757 A1 20011212; WO 0055865 A1 20000921; ZA 200107549 B 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040821

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INCORE SERVICES

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE