Global Patent Index - EP 1161779 A1

EP 1161779 A1 2001-12-12 - ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR WITH AT LEAST ONE INSULATION DISPLACEMENT CONTACT ELEMENT CONSISTING OF A SHEET METAL STAMPING, AND CORRESPONDING MATING CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR WITH AT LEAST ONE INSULATION DISPLACEMENT CONTACT ELEMENT CONSISTING OF A SHEET METAL STAMPING, AND CORRESPONDING MATING CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER MIT MINDESTENS EINEM SCHNEIDKLEMMKONTAKTELEMENT AUS EINEM BLECHSTANZTEIL SOWIE KORRESPONDIERENDER GEGENSTECKVERBINDER HIERZU

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE ENFICHABLE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN ELEMENT DE CONTACT A GUILLOTINE CONSTITUE PAR UNE PARTIE ESTAMPEE EN TOLE, ET CONTRE-CONNECTEUR CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1161779 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910740 A

Priority

  • DE 19911120 A
  • DE 19953593 A
  • EP 0001723 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6616476B1] The invention relates to an electrical plug connector comprising at least one plug connector housing and at least one insulation displacement contact element that can be plugged into the plug connector housing and comprises a sheet-metal stamping, which element has a contact baseplate, on which, on mutually opposite edges, a first contact plate and a second contact plate are integrally formed in one piece in a manner such that they are bent away in the same direction via a respective bending zone, the contact plates each having an insulation displacement contact device for a conductor wire, and contact-making elements for forming a contact-making device for making releasably pluggable contact with a mating plug contact element being provided on the insulation displacement contact element, in which case at least one contact plate is embodied as a contact arm in which the insulation displacement contact device is accommodated at its bending zone end region and whose free end has at least one element of the contact-making device, and to a mating plug connector having a mating plug connector housing which has a connection region, located in which there is at least one mating insulation displacement contact element for making contact with a conductor wire, and a plug receptacle device for a plug connector, said device being arranged in an extension of the connection region, in which case a contact zone of the mating insulation displacement contact element is formed in the manner of a printed circuit board edge contact element and projects into the plug receptacle device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055943A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6616476 B1 20030909; AU 3284400 A 20001004; EP 1161779 A1 20011212; EP 1161779 B1 20030219; WO 0055943 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001274

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001274 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE