Global Patent Index - EP 1161786 A1

EP 1161786 A1 2001-12-12 - A STRAIN RELIEF DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC CABLES, PREFERABLY IN AN APPARATUS OR TERMINAL BOX

Title (en)

A STRAIN RELIEF DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC CABLES, PREFERABLY IN AN APPARATUS OR TERMINAL BOX

Title (de)

ZUGENTLASTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE KABEL, VORZUGSWEISE IN EINEM APPARAT ODER ANSCHLUSSGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SOULAGEMENT DE LA TRACTION POUR CABLES ELECTRIQUES, DE PREFERENCE DANS UN APPAREIL OU UNE BOITE DE CONNEXION

Publication

EP 1161786 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00917536 A

Priority

  • SE 0000386 W
  • SE 9900785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054383A1] A strain relief device for electric cables in general and in particular in an apparatus or terminal box comprising a load-absorbing relieving member (3.1) with the aid of which a cable can be clamped against a counter-support (1). The relieving member (3.1) is displaceable in a direction towards the counter-support (1) in a guide arrangement (2.3) and can be locked in inserted position with the aid of a locking member (2.5), against a cable inserted through a cable opening (2.2). The relieving member (3.1) may be arranged on the inside of an apparatus or terminal box in direct connection with a cable opening (2.2). The relieving member may consist of a disk (3.1) with saw teeth (3.2), directed towards the wall (2) of the box and being in communication with corresponding teeth (2.4) on the locking member, which in turn consists of a locking tongue (2.5) forming a part of the wall (2) of the box.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02G 15/007; H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054383A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054383 A1 20000914; AT 416504 T 20081215; AU 3849200 A 20000928; DE 60040973 D1 20090115; DK 1161786 T3 20090504; EP 1161786 A1 20011212; EP 1161786 B1 20081203; ES 2316360 T3 20090416; PT 1161786 E 20090216; SE 513886 C2 20001120; SE 9900785 D0 19990305; SE 9900785 L 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160228

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60040973

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100830

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081203

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100830

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Free text: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS#89, BOULEVARD FRANKLIN ROOSEVELT#92500 RUEIL-MALMAISON (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS#89, BOULEVARD FRANKLIN ROOSEVELT#92500 RUEIL-MALMAISON (FR)

2009-12-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2316360 T3

2009-03-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090400485

2009-02-16 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2009-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040973 P 20090115

2009-01-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI