Global Patent Index - EP 1161856 A2

EP 1161856 A2 2001-12-12 - Centrifugal distributer, notably fertilizer spreader

Title (en)

Centrifugal distributer, notably fertilizer spreader

Title (de)

Zentrifugalstreuer, insbesondere Düngerstreuer

Title (fr)

Engin de distribution à distributeur centrifuge, notamment épandeur d'engrais

Publication

EP 1161856 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01110716 A

Priority

DE 10028236 A

Abstract (en)

The centrifugal fertilizer spreader has two contrarotating spreader disks (1) which feed fertilizer on to spreader fans with inner guide plates (13) mounted on pivots (14) on an inner frame (15) and outer guide plates (21) which can be independently swivelled. The inner plates are angled close to the direction of flow of the fertilizer while the outer plates diverge from it. An Independent claim is included for use of the spread limiting device in a fertilizer spreader.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Zentrifugaldüngerstreuer mit zwei um parallele Achsen gegensinnig umlaufenden Streuscheiben, die das aus einem Behälter dosiert aufgegebene Streugut in zwei einander überlappenden Streufächern abgeben, ist eine Einrichtung zum Grenz- oder Randstreuen mit aufrechten Leitplatten vorgesehen, die an ihren der Streuscheibe zugekehrten inneren Enden an aufrechten Achsen winkelverstellbar gelagert sind. Die Leitplatten sind ferner zweiteilig ausgebildet und die äußeren Leitplatten mit ihren inneren Enden an aufrechten Achsen winkelverstellbar gelagert, so daß die inneren Leitplatten etwa auf die Flugrichtung der Streugutpartikel und die äußeren Leitplatten davon abweichend einstellbar sind. Dadurch ist bei vorgegebenen, unterschiedlichen Arbeitsbreiten eine exakte Einstellung der Grenzstreubreite für beliebige Düngersorten möglich.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01C 17/001 (2013.01); A01C 17/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161856 A2 20011212; EP 1161856 A3 20021023; EP 1161856 B1 20040218; DE 10028236 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101492

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140515

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101492 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-10-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01C 17/00 A, 7A 01C 15/00 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI