Global Patent Index - EP 1161890 A1

EP 1161890 A1 2001-12-12 - A method for the manufacture of shoes and shoes thereby obtainable

Title (en)

A method for the manufacture of shoes and shoes thereby obtainable

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Schuhherstellung und durch dieses Verfahren hergestellter Schuh

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de chaussures et chaussure obtenue par ce procédé

Publication

EP 1161890 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830820 A

Priority

EP 00830820 A

Abstract (en)

A method for the manufacture of shoes comprising the operative phases of fastening an upper (2) onto an arch support (3) and subsequently applying the arch support (3) and the upper (2) to a sole (4). The operative phase of fastening the upper (2) onto the arch support (3) comprises the phases of attaching the upper (2) to a lining (6) of the arch support (3), and securing the lining (6) and the upper (2) attached thereto, to a template (5) constituting the structure of the arch support (3). The phase of attaching the upper (2) to the lining (6) comprises the phases of laying the lining (6), of laying the upper (2) on the lining (6) and of sewing the upper (2) to the lining (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 9/02; A43B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/10 (2006.01); A43B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 9/02 (2013.01); A43B 3/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161890 A1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI